Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/05/2019 at 03:45:21 (UTC).

TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB WEST, LLC VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB WEST, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB WEST, LLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

ASSEZ, JOANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bennett, Scott B.

Defendant Attorney

Diaz de Arce, Alexandra

 

Court Documents

Motion for Protective Order

05/07/2019 - Motion for Protective Order

Notice of Taking Deposition

04/29/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion for Extension of Time

04/12/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

03/14/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order:

02/12/2019 - Order:

Memorandum of Disposition

02/12/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Pre Trial Summons

01/11/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Admissions

01/09/2019 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

01/07/2019 - Statement of Claim

Order Extending Time for

04/03/2019 - Order Extending Time for

Order Extending Time for

04/03/2019 - Order Extending Time for

Order Extending Time for

04/03/2019 - Order Extending Time for

Motion for Extension of Time

03/04/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/12/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

02/08/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Email Notice:

01/09/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

01/09/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/09/2019 - Request for Production

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Protective Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY/NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: AGREED ON RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2630015AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:BENNETT, SCOTT B. 3377 SW 3RD AVE MIAMI FL 33145 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580028AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:BENNETT, SCOTT B. 3377 SW 3RD AVE MIAMI FL 33145 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00 RECEIPT DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Total Care Chiropractic & Rehab North Miami Beach, is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diaz de Arce, Alexandra