This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 04/30/2022 at 07:48:22 (UTC).

TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB WEST (LLC) VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB WEST LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Total Care Chiropractic & Rehab West (LLC)

Assignor

Saint-Velus, Badwet

Defendant

Progressive American Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Daly

Defendant Attorney

Reyes, Rafael, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Statement of Claim

01/12/2022 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/12/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Notice of Interrogatory

04/19/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Supplemental Request to Produce

04/19/2022 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Privilege Log

04/14/2022 - Privilege Log

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/14/2022 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

04/14/2022 - Response to Request for Production

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

03/11/2022 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

03/04/2022 - Response to Request for Admissions

Order Setting CM Deadline

03/02/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Motion for Extension of Time

02/28/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/18/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Service of Process

02/18/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Filing:

02/04/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

02/04/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Request for Admissions

02/04/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

02/04/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/04/2022 - Request for Production

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Progressive American Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020058AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/19/2022REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2920235AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:01/13/2022REGISTER#:292CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less