Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/19/2020 at 06:29:44 (UTC).

TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB NORTH MIAMI, LLC VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB NORTH MIAMI, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB NORTH MIAMI, LLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

CABRAL, KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bennett, Scott B.

Defendant Attorney

Cabrera, Cristina M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

07/22/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Summary Judgment

07/22/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

06/26/2019 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

05/09/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Motion for Protective Order

04/08/2019 - Motion for Protective Order

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

03/12/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Pre Trial Summons

01/24/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Email Notice:

01/17/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

01/17/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Filing:

06/26/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Response to Request for Production

04/09/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Memorandum

04/09/2019 - Memorandum

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

04/08/2019 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

04/08/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Order:

03/19/2019 - Order:

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/19/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Taking Deposition

01/17/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Production

01/17/2019 - Request for Production

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31643:3303; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Aff in Support of Mot for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXPERT WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT S MOTION TO SEEK...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3230018AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:WHITE, T ROGER, JR. 9999 NE 2ND AVE STE 306 MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2346 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2740040AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:BENNETT, SCOTT B. 3377 SW 3RD AVE MIAMI FL 33145 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3590031AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:BENNETT, SCOTT B. 3377 SW 3RD AVE MIAMI FL 33145 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Total Care Chiropractic & Rehab North Miami Beach, is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bennett, Scott B.