Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/03/2021 at 09:07:53 (UTC).

TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB NORTH MIAMI BEACH, VS OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB NORTH MIAMI BEACH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Total Care Chiropractic & Rehab North Miami Beach,

Defendant

Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

Assignee

Waight, Miriam

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Daly

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/26/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/18/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Statement of Claim

03/19/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/19/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2660034AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JOHN C DALY 8551 W SUNRISE BLVD SUITE 304 PLANTATION FL 33322 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/20/2021 REGISTER#:266CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2520056AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:JOHN C DALY 547 NW 9TH AVE STE 2 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33311-8113 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/23/2021 REGISTER#:252CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Total Care Chiropractic & Rehab North Miami Beach, is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daly, John C, Jr.