Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/24/2020 at 06:10:57 (UTC).

TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB NORTH MIAMI BEACH, VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB NORTH MIAMI BEACH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOTAL CARE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB NORTH MIAMI BEACH,

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Assignee

AUGUSTE, SABINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bennett, Scott B.

Defendant Attorneys

Barrangan, Arlene

Gaspari, Albert J., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

10/07/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Memorandum of Disposition

06/18/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

05/28/2019 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/24/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Order:

03/19/2019 - Order:

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/19/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Memorandum of Disposition

03/19/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Filing:

03/18/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Appearance

03/05/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

01/24/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Email Notice:

01/17/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Taking Deposition

01/17/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Interrogatory

01/17/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/17/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

01/17/2019 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

01/11/2019 - Statement of Claim

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: Miami Beach Courtroom 2-1 1130 Washington Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: PIP SCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2740036AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:BENNETT, SCOTT B. 3377 SW 3RD AVE MIAMI FL 33145 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3590032AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:BENNETT, SCOTT B. 3377 SW 3RD AVE MIAMI FL 33145 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Total Care Chiropractic & Rehab North Miami Beach, is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gaspari, Albert J., ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barrangan, Arlene