TOSHA WHARTON VS GUIRIBITEY COSMETIC & BEAUTY INSTITUTE, INC. ET AL

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/01/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

09/01/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/02/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/02/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/02/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

09/20/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

09/23/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

09/23/2021 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

10/01/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

10/11/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Dismiss

10/11/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Motion for Extension of Time

10/18/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Unavailability/absence

10/22/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Unavailability/absence

10/29/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence