This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/20/2023 at 13:28:25 (UTC).

TORRES ELECTRICAL SUPPLY COMPANY INC VS LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 TORRES ELECTRICAL SUPPLY COMPANY INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORRES ELECTRICAL SUPPLY COMPANY INC

Defendants

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

EVEREST REINSURANCE COMPANY

MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Kalmanson

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

01/17/2023 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Summary Judgment

01/17/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment

01/11/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment

01/10/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Default

01/10/2023 - Default

Motion to Strike

01/09/2023 - Motion to Strike

Motion for Default

01/09/2023 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

01/09/2023 - Service Returned

Notice of Default Not Entered

01/06/2023 - Notice of Default Not Entered

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/08/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

11/04/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/04/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event; Comments: PARTIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180173AMT PAID:$403.50NAME:BARRY KALMANSON500 N MAITLAND AVE STE 305MAITLAND FL 32751-4463COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$2.50$2.50TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$403.50RECEIPT DATE:11/08/2022REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY SPECIALTY INS CO is a litigant

Latest cases where MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EVEREST REINSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant