This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/27/2021 at 03:36:46 (UTC).

TONY MESTRE VS WALTER KEATON, JR. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 TONY MESTRE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALTER KEATON, JR. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mestre, Tony

Defendants

HMS SECURITY AND PROTECTION SERVICES

Keaton, Walter, Jr

J. Perez Enterprises, Inc.

HMS Group Enterprises Inc

Penn Marketplace LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Enfield, Theodore H.

Defendant Attorney

Callejo, Karen Hernandez

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/29/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

12/10/2019 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/29/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Email Notice:

01/09/2020 - Email Notice:

Service Returned

12/06/2019 - Service Returned

Civil Cover

10/24/2019 - Civil Cover

Motion:

04/27/2020 - Motion:

Notice of Production

08/10/2020 - Notice of Production

Response to Request for Production

07/09/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

02/16/2021 - Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Appearance

02/04/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

01/27/2021 - Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

Default

01/26/2021 - Default

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/22/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/22/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/22/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/21/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/21/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Callejo Karen Hernandez; J. Perez Enterprises Inc.; HMS SECURITY AND PROTECTION SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: J. Perez Enterprises Inc.; HMS SECURITY AND PROTECTION SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: HMS Group Enterprises Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Edison Marketplace Group LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3570301AMT PAID:$30.00 NAME:ENFIELD, THEODORE H. 19235 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 110 AVENTURA FL 33180-2311 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/29/2019 REGISTER#:357CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520395AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:ENFIELD, THEODORE H. 19235 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 110 AVENTURA FL 33180-2311 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/25/2019 REGISTER#:352CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less