This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/02/2023 at 00:49:24 (UTC).

TITAN FLORIDA, LLC VS PEDRO J GARCIA AS PROPERTY APPRAISER ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 TITAN FLORIDA, LLC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against PEDRO J GARCIA AS PROPERTY APPRAISER. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TITAN FLORIDA, LLC

Defendants

PEDRO J GARCIA as Property Appraiser

PETER CAM as Tax Collector

JIM ZINGALE as Executive Director of the FL DOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Risch, Patrick James

Defendant Attorney

Carlin, Ryan

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/19/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

12/19/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/23/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/23/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/23/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/27/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/27/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/27/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

04/04/2023 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

04/05/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

04/07/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

04/07/2023 - Service Returned

Answer

04/12/2023 - Answer

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/02/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

05/04/2023 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Carlin Ryan; PEDRO J GARCIA as Property Appraiser; PETER CAM as Tax Collector

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: JIM ZINGALE as Executive Director of the FL DOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: PEDRO J GARCIA as Property Appraiser

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: PEDRO J GARCIA as Property Appraiser

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050223AMT PAID:$30.00NAME:RISCH, PATRICK JAMES101 E KENNEDY BLVD STE 3700TAMPA FL 33602-5195COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:12/24/2022REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080139AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:RISCH, PATRICK JAMES101 E KENNEDY BLVD STE 3700TAMPA FL 33602-5195COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:12/20/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less