This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/17/2020 at 09:24:44 (UTC).

THOMAS T. MANG DC, PA DBA CHIRO & ACUPUNCTURE MED VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 THOMAS T MANG DC, PA DBA CHIRO ACUPUNCTURE MED filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas T. Mang DC, PA dba Chiro & Acupuncture Med

Assignor

Myers, Michael

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rock, Gregory

Defendant Attorney

Brooks, Jonathan S

 

Court Documents

Privilege Log

06/13/2019 - Privilege Log

Order:

06/12/2019 - Order:

Memorandum of Disposition

06/05/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Request:

05/15/2019 - Request:

Response to Request for Admissions

05/08/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Memorandum of Disposition

04/22/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Letter of Correspondence

04/01/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

Request for Production

04/01/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/01/2019 - Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

06/13/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

06/04/2019 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Request:

05/15/2019 - Request:

Order:

05/14/2019 - Order:

Motion for Relief from Judgment

05/08/2019 - Motion for Relief from Judgment

Notice of Hearing-

04/22/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

04/18/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Motion:

04/01/2019 - Motion:

Demand for Jury Trial

04/01/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCancellation Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: POLICY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2090003AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/12/2019 REGISTER#:209CASHIER:ELIZABE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSP Pretrial New Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580006AMT PAID:$80.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/17/2019 REGISTER#:358CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less