Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/21/2020 at 23:56:29 (UTC).

THOMAS ROUSH M.D. D/B/A COLUMNA INC. VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 THOMAS ROUSH M D D/B/A COLUMNA INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Roush M.D. d/b/a Columna Inc.

Defendant

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Assignee

Thompson, Natanya

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Patino Law Firm

Defendant Attorneys

La Montagne, Rachel

Sargent, Ivane

Shapiro, Cari R.

 

Court Documents

Motion for Sanctions

07/18/2019 - Motion for Sanctions

Motion:

07/18/2019 - Motion:

Motion:

07/18/2019 - Motion:

Motion:

06/06/2019 - Motion:

Motion:

06/06/2019 - Motion:

Order:

03/08/2019 - Order:

Notice of Service of Process

03/08/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/08/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Statement of Claim

01/18/2019 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

12/16/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Motion for Summary Judgment

10/21/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Response to Request for Production

10/09/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

10/09/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

10/09/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

10/09/2019 - Request for Admissions

Reply

09/30/2019 - Reply

Answer

09/25/2019 - Answer

Order:

09/20/2019 - Order:

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PIP SCHEDULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: Miami Beach Courtroom 2-1 1130 Washington Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2730007AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/22/2019 REGISTER#:273CASHIER:CAL5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3590053AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/23/2019 REGISTER#:359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shapiro, Cari R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer La Montagne, Rachel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARGENT IVANE