This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/12/2020 at 03:22:27 (UTC).

THOMAS E FRYER, JR. VS. MARGINTINA MERWEATHER

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 THOMAS E FRYER, JR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARGINTINA MERWEATHER. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRYER, THOMAS E, Jr

Defendant

MERWEATHER, MARGINTINA

Not Classified By Court

L&T

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Issued

03/17/2020 - Writ of Possession Issued

Final Judgment by Judge

03/06/2020 - Final Judgment by Judge

Order on Motion to Strike

03/06/2020 - Order on Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike

03/06/2020 - Motion to Strike

Affidavit as to Costs

02/26/2020 - Affidavit as to Costs

Motion to Strike

02/26/2020 - Motion to Strike

Answer

02/21/2020 - Answer

Service Returned

02/19/2020 - Service Returned

Complaint

02/13/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: WRIT SENT TO SHERIFF WITH $115 CHECK Parties: MERWEATHER MARGINTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31852:4608; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MERWEATHER MARGINTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND ENTERING DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MERWEATHER MARGINTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FINAL JUDGMENT SENT TO JUDGE 05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2490001AMT PAID:$3.50 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2143-ADM. & SEAL OATH1$3.50$3.50 TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$5.00 TENDER TYPE:CHANGETENDER AMT:($1.50) RECEIPT DATE:02/26/202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event; Comments: NON PAYMENT FOR RENT AND NON MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MERWEATHER MARGINTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MERWEATHER MARGINTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2660032AMT PAID:$195.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$195.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/13/202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MERWEATHER MARGINTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.