This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/12/2021 at 00:32:57 (UTC).

THE PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI- DADE COUNTY VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 THE PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI- DADE COUNTY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Public Health Trust of Miami- Dade County

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neil V Singh

Defendant Attorney

Griggs, Erinn Mia

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

06/18/2021 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion for Extension of Time

05/25/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

05/25/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Request for Production

04/13/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/13/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

04/13/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Appearance

04/13/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

03/26/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

03/03/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/03/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-3 3100 Ponce de Leon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2130094AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$180.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/26/2021 REGISTER#:213CASHIER:E325218

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570054AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:NEIL V SINGH 10100 W SAMPLE ROAD, THIRD FLOOR CORAL SPRING FL 33065 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/05/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County The is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Griggs, Erinn Mia