This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/23/2020 at 17:52:26 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON F K A THE BANK OF NE VS MARIA T VALDES ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON F K A THE BANK OF NE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARIA T VALDES. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON F K A THE BANK OF NE

Defendants

VALDES, MARIA T

POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROP, UNKNOWN PERSON S IN

MARIA T VALDES, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF

WEITZER SERENA LAKES HOMES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vandergriff, Lea W.

Defendant Attorney

Leon-Rubido, Marlene

 

Court Documents

Final Disposition Document

03/06/2020 - Final Disposition Document

Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

01/14/2020 - Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

Non-Military Affidavit

01/14/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Non-Military Affidavit

01/14/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice of Filing:

01/14/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Service Return for Unknown Party

01/08/2020 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Answer

12/27/2019 - Answer

Answer

11/27/2019 - Answer

Lis Pendens

11/18/2019 - Lis Pendens

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/21/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Filing:

11/18/2019 - Notice of Filing:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/20/2019 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/20/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/20/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/20/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice:

11/18/2019 - Notice:

Memorandum

11/18/2019 - Memorandum

Civil Cover

11/18/2019 - Civil Cover

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31914:1239; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: VERIFIED STATEMENT AS TO MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3600377AMT PAID:$915.00 NAME:VANDERGRIFF, LEA W. 8201 PETERS RD STE 3000 PLANTATION FL 33324-3292 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.00 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 31732:218; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF PREVIOUS FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.