This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/22/2023 at 02:59:05 (UTC).

TELEFONICA GLOBAL SOLUTIONS USA, INC. VS PEDRO J. GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 TELEFONICA GLOBAL SOLUTIONS USA, INC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TELEFONICA GLOBAL SOLUTIONS USA, INC.

Defendants

PEDRO J. GARCIA, as Property Appraiser

PETER CAM, as Tax Collector

JIM ZINGALE, as Executive Director of the FL DOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Risch, Patrick James

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/15/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

12/15/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/20/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/20/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/20/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/22/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/22/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/22/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Interrogatory

02/24/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/24/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

03/17/2023 - Notice of Appearance

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100016AMT PAID:$30.00NAME:RISCH, PATRICK JAMES101 E KENNEDY BLVD STE 3700TAMPA FL 33602-5195COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:12/23/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: JIM ZINGALE as Executive Director of the FL DOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: PETER CAM as Tax Collector

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: PEDRO J. GARCIA as Property Appraiser

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120024AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:RISCH, PATRICK JAMES101 E KENNEDY BLVD STE 3700TAMPA FL 33602-5195COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:12/17/2022REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less