This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 04/03/2023 at 02:26:02 (UTC).

TELEEMC, LLC VS SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 TELEEMC, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TELEEMC, LLC

Assignor

BABULA, CHELSEA

Defendant

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Myones, Howard

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/30/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/30/2023 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/31/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

03/09/2023 - Service Returned

Voluntary Dismissal

03/30/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33646:62; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3240002AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MYONES, HOWARD1005 W STATE ROAD 84 SUITE 514FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33315COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/03/2023REGISTER#:324CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160015AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:MYONES, HOWARD1005 W STATE ROAD 84 SUITE 514FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33315COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:01/31/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less