This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/10/2022 at 17:04:54 (UTC).

TD BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS MARALF GROUP LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 TD BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARALF GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank National Association

Defendants

Maralf Group LLC

Marron, Carlos E

Coral Gables, FL 33156

MARRON, CARLOS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/24/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/24/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/29/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/29/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/03/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/03/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

12/15/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/15/2021 - Service Returned

Motion for Extension of Time

12/29/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Extending Time for

12/29/2021 - Order Extending Time for

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: CARLOS E. MARRON A/K/A CARLOS MARRON (SUMMONS ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: MARALF GROUP, LLC (SUMMONS ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Maralf Group LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Marron Carlos E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160117AMT PAID:$20.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:12/02/2021REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050129AMT PAID:$401.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:11/25/2021REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant