This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 15:09:36 (UTC).

TD BANK NA VS ROBERTO A LOPEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 TD BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ROBERTO A LOPEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank NA

Defendants

Lopez, Roberto A

Midland Credit Management Inc

Midland Funding LLC

Pearl Beta Funding

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

TD Bank USA NA

Bank of America NA

Cach LLC

Cavalry SPV I LLC

Lopez, Kimberly

LVNV Funding LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Danielle R. Burns, Esq

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default

02/22/2023 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

02/09/2023 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Default

02/09/2023 - Default

Motion for Default

02/08/2023 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

01/27/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/27/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/27/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/27/2023 - Service Returned

Answer

01/27/2023 - Answer

Service Returned

01/26/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/20/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/20/2023 - Service Returned

Summons Returned - No Service

01/13/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Return for Unknown Party

01/13/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

01/13/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/13/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/13/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/13/2023 - Service Returned

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Pearl Beta Funding

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Midland Credit Management Inc; Midland Funding LLC; Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC; Bank of America NA; Cach LLC; Cavalry SPV I LLC; LVNV Funding LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lopez Roberto A; Lopez Kimberly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Pearl Beta Funding

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cach LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Bank of America NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: TD Bank USA NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180001AMT PAID:$932.50NAME:DANIELLE R. BURNS, ESQDUANE MORRIS LLP 1875 NW CORPORATE BLVD., SUITE 30BOCA RATON FL 33431-8561COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$17.50$17.503142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$932.50RECEIPT DATE:01/05/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33530:1038; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less