This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/02/2020 at 02:05:59 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS ANGEL GUERRA

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANGEL GUERRA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-24

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

GUERRA, ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jovanovich, Zoran David

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

03/27/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Suggestion of Bankruptcy

03/23/2020 - Suggestion of Bankruptcy

Final Disposition Document

03/27/2020 - Final Disposition Document

Voluntary Dismissal

03/27/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Suggestion of Bankruptcy

03/23/2020 - Suggestion of Bankruptcy

Service Returned

03/05/2020 - Service Returned

Complaint

11/18/2019 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31883:1926; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Suggestion of Bankruptcy; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Suggestion of Bankruptcy; Book/Page: 31877:21; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2100170AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/20/2019 REGISTER#:210CASHIER:ANDYM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GUERRA ANGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3680014AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:JOVANOVICH, ZORAN DAVID ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. 700 WEST HILLSBORO BLVD DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33441-1612 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.