This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/20/2021 at 03:51:53 (UTC).

SYMONS FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC, PA VS TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 SYMONS FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC, PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYMONS FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC, PA

Assignor

Pierre, Pierrisma

Defendant

TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/01/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Statement of Claim

07/09/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/09/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030065AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/02/2021 REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2960012AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/13/2021 REGISTER#:296CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Symons Family Chiropractic, PA is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.