This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/28/2023 at 03:42:41 (UTC).

SUNSHINE CLEAN INC VS AMERICAN SECURITY INS CO

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 SUNSHINE CLEAN INC filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN SECURITY INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunshine Clean Inc

Assignor

Bien Aime, Fadilien

Defendant

American Security Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russel M Lazega

Defendant Attorney

David R Heffernan

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/17/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/17/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

01/17/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/18/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/23/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/08/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/14/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

02/17/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Response to Request for Admissions

02/21/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/21/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: American Security Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090123AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:RUSSEL M LAZEGA45 E SHERIDAN STDANIA BEACH FL 33004-4352COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/10/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: American Security Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120187AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:RUSSEL M LAZEGA45 E SHERIDAN STDANIA BEACH FL 33004-4352COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140530AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:RUSSEL M LAZEGA45 E SHERIDAN STDANIA BEACH FL 33004-4352COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:01/18/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $4873.64

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less