This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/12/2022 at 05:39:04 (UTC).

STUART B KROST (MD) (PA) VS PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 STUART B KROST MD PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stuart B Krost (MD) (PA)

Assignor

Walder, Charles

Defendant

Progressive Express Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Daly

Defendant Attorney

Pena, Andres M, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/24/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

11/24/2021 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/29/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/08/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice:

01/04/2022 - Notice:

Motion for Extension of Time

01/07/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Progressive Express Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140060AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/02/2021REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110274AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:JOHN C DALY1380 N. UNIVERSITY DRIVE, SUITE 200PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:11/25/2021REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive Express Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pena, Andres M, ESQ