This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/03/2021 at 01:28:38 (UTC).

STEVEN R LEFLORE VS MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 STEVEN R LEFLORE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MIAMI-DADE COUNTY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LeFlore, Steven R

Defendant

Miami-Dade County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Polsky, Joshua E.

Defendant Attorneys

Lepore Korissa

Cohen, Nykeah L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance

09/07/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

09/03/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

08/31/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/17/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

08/17/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Interrogatory

08/11/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

08/11/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

08/11/2021 - Request for Production

Complaint

08/11/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/11/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lepore Korissa; Miami-Dade County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cohen Nykeah L; Miami-Dade County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Miami-Dade County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040129AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:POLSKY, JOSHUA E. BERNSTEIN / POLSKY 915 MIDDLE RIVER DRIVE, SUITE 3 FT. LAUDERDALE FL 33304 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/18/2021 REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Miami-Dade County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970177AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:POLSKY, JOSHUA E. BERNSTEIN / POLSKY 915 MIDDLE RIVER DRIVE, SUITE 3 FT. LAUDERDALE FL 33304 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/12/2021 REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miami Dade County Fire Rescue is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cohen, Nykeah L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lepore, Korissa