This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/09/2019 at 05:26:16 (UTC).

STEPHANIE TORRES VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 STEPHANIE TORRES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORRES, STEPHANIE

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Molina, Mario

Defendant Attorneys

Kluck, Aileen L

Suarez-Arias, Cristina

 

Court Documents

Response:

04/25/2019 - Response:

Notice of Hearing-

03/12/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

03/06/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

03/06/2019 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Amended Complaint

02/13/2019 - Amended Complaint

Complaint

01/16/2019 - Complaint

Service Returned

01/24/2019 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/22/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/17/2019 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Memorandum of Disposition

04/30/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order:

04/30/2019 - Order:

Order:

04/30/2019 - Order:

Response to Motion

02/28/2019 - Response to Motion

Notice of Hearing-

02/27/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Dismiss

02/13/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Appearance

02/13/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

02/13/2019 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/22/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31435:1576; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: DENYING DEF'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT INFINITY INDEMNITY INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: DENYING DEF'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: SET BY SABRINA PLTF. OKWOPC 305-506-4746

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: SABRINA/DAMARYS

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530059AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:VENKATESH, VIN ROY 9703 S DIXIE HWY STE 201 MIAMI FL 33156 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450014AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:MOLINA, MARIO 9703 SOUTH DIXIE HIGHWAY SUITE 201 MIAMI FL 33156 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: 15,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 10:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.