This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/07/2022 at 21:45:22 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS CHELLY ATTIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHELLY ATTIA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Henderson, Johnny

Defendants

Attia, Chelly

Attia, Sandra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Troy R. Lotane, Esquire

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/19/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

11/19/2021 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

12/13/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Service Returned

12/23/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/23/2021 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:30AM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2050014AMT PAID:$20.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/13/2021REGISTER#:205CASHIER:JFONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Attia Chelly; Attia Sandra

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080078AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:TROY R. LOTANE, ESQUIRE1980 MICHIGAN AVECOCOA FL 32922-5729COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:11/23/2021REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R