This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/22/2021 at 13:48:26 (UTC).

STACY WEIN VS AFSCME FLORIDA COUNCIL 79 ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STACY WEIN filed an Other lawsuit against AFSCME FLORIDA COUNCIL 79. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wein, Stacy

Defendants

Hall, Vicki

AFSCME Florida Council 79

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew S Sarelson Esq

Josephs, Adam Charles

Mark A Emanuele

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint

09/20/2021 - Amended Complaint

Notice:

09/20/2021 - Notice:

Response to Motion

09/03/2021 - Response to Motion

Motion to Compel

08/18/2021 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Taking Deposition

08/18/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion for Extension of Time

08/16/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Taking Deposition

07/21/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Production

07/16/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

07/16/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Hearing-

07/14/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

07/14/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

07/06/2021 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Attachment and/or Exhibit to Order

07/06/2021 - Attachment and/or Exhibit to Order

AgreedOrder

07/06/2021 - AgreedOrder

Notice of Hearing-

06/24/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Taking Deposition

06/17/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

05/25/2021 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Subpoena

05/25/2021 - Subpoena

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AND A PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF RESCHEDULING MOTION CALENDAR HEARING FOR SEPTEMBER 30, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: AUGUST 20, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Parties: Mark A Emanuele; AFSCME Florida Council 79; Hall Vicki

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Waiver:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AFSCME Florida Council 79; Hall Vicki

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2490341AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:MATTHEW S SARELSON ESQ 600 BRICKELL AVE STE 1715 MIAMI FL 33131-3076 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/25/2020 REGISTER#:249CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew S Sarelson Esq

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Josephs, Adam Charles