This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/20/2023 at 16:23:04 (UTC).

STACY GRAHAM VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 STACY GRAHAM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAHAM, STACY

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Low, David

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/19/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

12/19/2022 - Complaint

Request for Admissions

12/19/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

12/19/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

12/19/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

12/26/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/29/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990121AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:LOW, DAVID2101 WEST COMMERICAL BLVD STE#2800FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/29/2022REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040068AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:LOW, DAVID2101 WEST COMMERICAL BLVD STE#2800FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:12/21/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less