This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/24/2019 at 13:35:00 (UTC).

ST. PETERSBURG CHIROPRACTIC INJURY & REHAB VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 ST PETERSBURG CHIROPRACTIC INJURY REHAB filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST. PETERSBURG CHIROPRACTIC INJURY & REHAB

Assignor

FALCONE, SHELIA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lakey, Tanner D

Defendant Attorney

Fresco, Eric M, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Request:

03/27/2019 - Request:

Memorandum of Disposition

02/20/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice:

04/11/2019 - Notice:

Motion for Extension of Time

03/12/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/29/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion for Extension of Time

03/27/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

02/28/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Letter of Correspondence

03/01/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

Request for Production

03/01/2019 - Request for Production

Motion for Final Judgment

04/12/2019 - Motion for Final Judgment

Reply

04/01/2019 - Reply

Response to Request for Admissions

03/11/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Motion for Final Judgment

04/03/2019 - Motion for Final Judgment

Request for Admissions

03/01/2019 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

01/09/2019 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

03/01/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Pre Trial Summons

02/08/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketFinal Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31493:4058; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketSP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040005AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/08/2019 REGISTER#:304CASHIER:CAL5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480017AMT PAID:$80.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/12/2019 REGISTER#:348CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.