This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/24/2020 at 08:24:36 (UTC).

SPRINGS CROSSING IMAGING,LLC. VS THE RESPONSIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 SPRINGS CROSSING IMAGING,LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THE RESPONSIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRINGS CROSSING IMAGING,LLC.

Assignor

Dionicio, Alexis

Defendant

THE RESPONSIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Berger, Martin I

Defendant Attorney

Charles L Vaccaro

 

Court Documents

Notice:

05/20/2020 - Notice:

Request for Production

05/20/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Copies

04/30/2020 - Request for Copies

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/22/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Reply

04/21/2020 - Reply

Motion to Transfer

04/16/2020 - Motion to Transfer

Response to Request for Production

04/16/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

04/16/2020 - Response to Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

04/16/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

03/19/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Admissions

02/20/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

02/20/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/20/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Amended Statement of Claim

02/20/2020 - Amended Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

02/13/2020 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

02/13/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/13/2020 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

02/13/2020 - Statement of Claim

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Transfer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220004AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/20/2020 REGISTER#:322CASHIER:DAVERNF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: THE RESPONSIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440042AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:BERGER, MARTIN I 9700 S DIXIE HWY STE 850 MIAMI FL 33156-2800 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.