This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/24/2020 at 09:01:53 (UTC).

SPINE & ORTHOPEDIC SPECIALISTS OF SF VS ALLSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 SPINE ORTHOPEDIC SPECIALISTS OF SF filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spine & Orthopedic Specialists of SF

Defendant

Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company

Assignee

Novelli, Celia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

White, T Roger, Jr

Defendant Attorney

Doyle, Kellyn E

 

Court Documents

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

05/22/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

AgreedOrder

05/21/2020 - AgreedOrder

Motion for Extension of Time

05/20/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Response to Request for Production

05/15/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

04/23/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/23/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

04/20/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Answer and Affirmative Defense

04/20/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Pre Trial Summons

02/24/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

02/13/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTED DFNTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2360021AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/24/2020 REGISTER#:236CASHIER:ANGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440060AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:WHITE, T ROGER, JR. 9999 NE 2ND AVE STE 306 MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2346 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.