This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/25/2021 at 19:40:35 (UTC).

SPINE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, INC. VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 SPINE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPINE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, INC.

Assignor

Tassy, Ronel

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

Defendant Attorney

Dichek, Jarred S., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

09/28/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Request:

09/28/2020 - Request:

Amended Motion

09/28/2020 - Amended Motion

Memorandum of Disposition

09/15/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

AgreedOrder

09/15/2020 - AgreedOrder

Notice of Hearing-

09/02/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Demand for Jury Trial

08/28/2020 - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Compliance

08/28/2020 - Notice of Compliance

Notice of Filing:

08/06/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Request:

08/06/2020 - Request:

Notice of Filing:

08/06/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

08/06/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

08/06/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

08/06/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

08/06/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

08/06/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

08/06/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

08/06/2020 - Notice of Filing:

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JGMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: Caleb Courtroom 2-2 5400 N.W. 22nd Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR IN THEALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: SEPT. 15, 2020 @ 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: PN'S COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2070029AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2390009AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPINE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.