This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/04/2023 at 05:06:48 (UTC).

SPACE COAST CREDIT UNION VS SERGIO DURAN

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 SPACE COAST CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SERGIO DURAN. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Space Coast Credit Union

Defendant

Duran, Sergio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grayson, Moises T.

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey, Douglas J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/24/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/24/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/26/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/27/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/30/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Certificate of Service

02/13/2023 - Certificate of Service

Notice of Appearance

03/15/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

03/15/2023 - Email Notice:

Motion for Extension of Time

04/07/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Interrogatory

04/07/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/07/2023 - Request for Production

Response to Request for Production

05/04/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

05/04/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Motion to Compel

05/05/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

05/05/2023 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Hearing-

05/12/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Dismiss

05/10/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/06/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 3:30PM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION TO DISMISS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 3:30PM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ||DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 6-5-2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Duran Sergio

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 3. Parties: Duran Sergio

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130374AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GRAYSON, MOISES T.25 SE 2ND AVE STE 730MIAMI FL 33131-1696COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/27/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130022AMT PAID:$400.00NAME:GRAYSON, MOISES T.25 SE 2ND AVE STE 730MIAMI FL 33131-1696COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$400.00RECEIPT DATE:01/27/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less