This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/17/2022 at 23:47:13 (UTC).

SOUTH FLORIDA WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICT VS. ANTONIO MIYAR ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 SOUTH FLORIDA WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICT filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against ANTONIO MIYAR. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendants

Diagnostic Imaging Associates, LLC

American Express Bank, FSB

Warren Henry Automobiles, Inc.

Purrinos, Andres

Mathon Investments Corporation

Florida Power & Light Company

Quintana, Jorge Fernandez

American General Finance of America, Inc.

National Revenue Service, Inc.

CACH, LLC

US Attorneys Office - Southern District of FL

BYE Finance, LLC

Mayors Jeweler, Inc.

National Revenue Services, Inc.

NCO Portfolio Management, Inc.

Dove Investment Corporation

Surf Consultants, Inc.

R. Lale B., Ismael

Town of Miami Lakes

Precision Recovery Analytics, Inc.

67 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Kyle B. Teal

Rodriguez-Varela, Nelson

Fisher, Stacey S

Other Attorneys

Braun, Maryann

Michael J Tomkiewicz Esq

Ottinot, Hans

Herman, Debra S.

Francisco J Pines

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate

08/12/2022 - Clerk's Certificate

Clerk's Certificate

08/12/2022 - Clerk's Certificate

Clerk's Certificate

08/12/2022 - Clerk's Certificate

Court Order (Recordable)

06/22/2022 - Court Order (Recordable)

Court Order (Recordable)

06/21/2022 - Court Order (Recordable)

Court Order (Recordable)

06/21/2022 - Court Order (Recordable)

Notice:

07/15/2022 - Notice:

Notice:

07/15/2022 - Notice:

Notice:

07/15/2022 - Notice:

Motion:

06/21/2022 - Motion:

Motion:

06/21/2022 - Motion:

Motion:

06/21/2022 - Motion:

Motion:

05/24/2022 - Motion:

Notice:

05/23/2022 - Notice:

Notice:

05/23/2022 - Notice:

549 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Clerk's Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: COPY - CERTIFICATE OF PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Clerk's Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: COPY - CERTIFICATE OF PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Clerk's Certificate; Event Type: Event; Comments: COPY - CERTIFICATE OF PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2110010AMT PAID:$170.00NAME:SO FL WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICCOMMENT:CLERK'S FEE GR100-143ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3115-ED COURT REG. FEE1$170.00$170.00TENDER TYPE:EXEMPTTENDER AMT:$170.00RECEIPT DATE:07/18/2022REGISTER#:211CASHIER:YADIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2110009AMT PAID:$19,200.00NAME:SO FL WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICTCOMMENT:GR100-143ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3114-ED COURT REG DEPOS1$19,200.00$19,200.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$19,200.00RECEIPT DATE:07/18/2022REGISTER#:211CASHIER:YADIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2110008AMT PAID:$170.00NAME:S. FL WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICTCOMMENT:CLERK'S FEE GR100-142ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3115-ED COURT REG. FEE1$170.00$170.00TENDER TYPE:EXEMPTTENDER AMT:$170.00RECEIPT DATE:07/18/2022REGISTER#:211CASHIER:YADIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2110007AMT PAID:$18,000.00NAME:SO. FL WATER MANAGEMENT DISTRITCOMMENT:ORD OF TAKING GR100-142ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3114-ED COURT REG DEPOS1$18,000.00$18,000.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$18,000.00RECEIPT DATE:07/18/2022REGISTER#:211CASHIER:YADIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2110006AMT PAID:$170.00NAME:SO. FL WATER MANGEMENT DISTRICTCOMMENT:E.D. CLERK'S FEE GR100-141ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3115-ED COURT REG. FEE1$170.00$170.00TENDER TYPE:EXEMPTTENDER AMT:$170.00RECEIPT DATE:07/18/2022REGISTER#:211CASHIER:YADIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2110005AMT PAID:$18,000.00NAME:S. FLWATER MANAGEMENT DISTRICTCOMMENT:ORD OF TAKIN GR100-141ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3114-ED COURT REG DEPOS1$18,000.00$18,000.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$18,000.00RECEIPT DATE:07/18/2022REGISTER#:211CASHIER:YADIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF DEPOSIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
596 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON 05-03-2021 AT 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580119AMT PAID:$837.50NAME:BRAUN, MARYANN3400 W COMMERCIAL BLVDFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309-3421COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$207.50$207.503142-RECORDING FEE1$224.00$224.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EXEMPTTENDER AMT:$837.50RECEIPT DATE:11/21/2020REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32214:173; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DECLARATION OF TAKING AND ESTIMATE OF VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MATHON INVESTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where Diagnostic Imaging Assoc (llc) is a litigant

Latest cases where Warren Henry Automobiles Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where COLLINS FINANCIAL SERVICES INC is a litigant