This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/08/2023 at 05:45:58 (UTC).

SOUTH FLORIDA SECURITY GROUP INC. VS LANDMARK AT DORAL HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 SOUTH FLORIDA SECURITY GROUP INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LANDMARK AT DORAL HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

South Florida Security Group Inc.

Defendant

Landmark At Doral Homeowners Association, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey, Douglas J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/16/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/16/2022 - Complaint

Request for Production

11/16/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

11/16/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

11/16/2022 - Request for Admissions

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/17/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/18/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

11/28/2022 - Service Returned

Motion for Default

02/07/2023 - Motion for Default

Default

02/09/2023 - Default

Order Setting CM Deadline

03/21/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Voluntary Dismissal

05/09/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33701:2608; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITHOUT PREJUDICE Parties: Landmark At Doral Homeowners Association Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Landmark At Doral Homeowners Association Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140092AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:JEFFREY, DOUGLAS J.LAW OFFICES OF DOUGLAS J. JEFFREY PA 6625 MIAMI LAMIAMI LAKES FL 33014-2705COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:11/19/2022REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Landmark At Doral Homeowners Association Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160367AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JEFFREY, DOUGLAS J.LAW OFFICES OF DOUGLAS J. JEFFREY PA 6625 MIAMI LAMIAMI LAKES FL 33014-2705COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:11/17/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less