This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/06/2023 at 12:18:10 (UTC).

SOUTH FLORIDA SECURITY GROUP INC. VS 400 SUNNY ISLES MASTER ASSOCIATION, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 SOUTH FLORIDA SECURITY GROUP INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 400 SUNNY ISLES MASTER ASSOCIATION, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

South Florida Security Group Inc.

Defendant

400 Sunny Isles Master Association, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey, Douglas J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/16/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

11/16/2022 - Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

11/16/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

11/16/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

11/16/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Pre Trial Summons

11/23/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Service Returned

12/05/2022 - Service Returned

Motion for Extension of Time

12/22/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

12/22/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Settlement Agreement

12/23/2022 - Settlement Agreement

Stipulation for Dismissal

01/10/2023 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

01/10/2023 - Order of Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

01/10/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33539:91; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Dismissal; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022

HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:30AM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2180012AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:11/23/2022REGISTER#:218CASHIER:SFLOWER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022

DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: 400 Sunny Isles Master Association Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150113AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:JEFFREY, DOUGLAS J.LAW OFFICES OF DOUGLAS J. JEFFREY PA 6625 MIAMI LAMIAMI LAKES FL 33014-2705COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:11/17/2022REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less