This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/17/2022 at 04:31:06 (UTC).

SOPHIA STATUM VS UNIVERSITY OF MIAMI ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 SOPHIA STATUM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNIVERSITY OF MIAMI. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Statum, Sophia

Defendants

Lybrand, Mark Alan

Romero, Leberty

of Miami, University

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ruben V. Chavez, Esquire

Defendant Attorney

Thomas, Damian E

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

08/13/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Case Management Report

10/04/2021 - Case Management Report

Request for Copies

09/14/2021 - Request for Copies

Notice of Production

09/07/2021 - Notice of Production

Response to Request for Production

08/30/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

08/30/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Supplemental Request to Produce

08/19/2021 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Case Management Report

08/13/2021 - Case Management Report

Voluntary Dismissal

08/13/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice:

08/13/2021 - Notice:

Motion for Extension of Time

08/03/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

07/20/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

07/20/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

07/15/2021 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Order Extending Time for

06/30/2021 - Order Extending Time for

Notice:

06/22/2021 - Notice:

Cancellation Notice

06/22/2021 - Cancellation Notice

Notice of Hearing-

06/18/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Report; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Supplemental Request to Produce; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Report; Event Type: Event; Comments: JOINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32682:3379; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Romero Leberty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT'S OF WITHDRAWA

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Romero Leberty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: of Miami University

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2610029AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:RUBEN V. CHAVEZ, ESQUIRETHE LAW OFFICES OF RUBEN V. CHAVEZ PA 10689 NORTHMIAMI FL 33176COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:04/08/2021REGISTER#:261CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miami University is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chavez, Ruben V