This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/09/2019 15:56:31

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by SONCINI, MAXIMO against RIVERS, TANYA in the jurisdiction of Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number *************C-04
  • Filing Date 10/11/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Florida Dade Court System
  • Courthouse Miami-Dade County Courthouse
  • County Miami-Dade
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Respondent Rivers, Tanya
  • Petitioner Soncini, Maximo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • Uncontest/diss; Event Type: Hearing
  • 10/21/2019
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12-18-19 10AM
  • 10/12/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510034AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:MARRERO, JULIO C 3850 BIRD ROAD PENTHOUSE ONE MIAMI FL 33146 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$409.00
  • 10/11/2019
  • Notice of Filing and Serving Administrative Order; Event Type: Event
  • 10/11/2019
  • Marital Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event
  • 10/11/2019
  • Answer and Waiver; Event Type: Event
  • 10/11/2019
  • Waiver and Acceptance of Service; Event Type: Event
  • 10/11/2019
  • Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event
  • 10/11/2019
  • Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event
  • 10/11/2019
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event
  • 10/11/2019
  • Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event
  • 10/11/2019
  • Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event
  • 10/11/2019
  • Petition; Event Type: Event
  • 10/11/2019
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event
  • 12/18/2019
  • Hearing Info: Uncontest/diss; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.