This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 03:32:45 (UTC).

SOLOMON BROMBERG ET AL VS HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 SOLOMON BROMBERG filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bromberg, Solomon

Bromberg, Cindy

Defendant

Insurance Company Inc, Homeowners Choice Property and Casualty

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Borshchukov Vyacheslav

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/07/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/07/2022 - Complaint

Request for Admissions

07/07/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

07/07/2022 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/12/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/18/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

08/12/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

08/22/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Insurance Company Inc Homeowners Choice Property and Casualty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120183AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:BORSHCHUKOV VYACHESLAVVYACHESLAV BORSHCHUKOV, P.A. 514 SE 11TH COURTFORT LAUDERDALE FL 68274COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:07/15/2022REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060214AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:BORSHCHUKOV VYACHESLAVVYACHESLAV BORSHCHUKOV, P.A. 514 SE 11TH COURTFORT LAUDERDALE FL 68274COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:07/09/2022REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Borshchukov Vyacheslav