This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/17/2023 at 03:27:55 (UTC).

SOLEX INVESTMENTS, LLC VS MIGUEL ROMANI ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 SOLEX INVESTMENTS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MIGUEL ROMANI. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLEX INVESTMENTS, LLC

Defendants

ROMANI, MIGUEL

QUEVEDO, PATRICIO A.

PETER CAM AS TAX COLLECTOR MIAMI-DADE COUNTY FLOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arcia, John P., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Lis Pendens

08/26/2022 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

08/23/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/23/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Motion for Default

01/11/2023 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

01/11/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Proof of Publication

01/11/2023 - Proof of Publication

Order of Default

01/11/2023 - Order of Default

Order Setting CM Deadline

01/03/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Proof of Publication

12/28/2022 - Proof of Publication

Notice of Action - Publication

11/30/2022 - Notice of Action - Publication

Affidavit of Constructive Service

11/22/2022 - Affidavit of Constructive Service

Non-Military Affidavit

11/22/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit of Diligent Search

11/22/2022 - Affidavit of Diligent Search

Summons Returned - No Service

10/28/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Answer and Affirmative Defense

10/12/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Service Returned

09/26/2022 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: MAILOUTS - 0 Parties: QUEVEDO PATRICIO A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Constructive Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FOR PATRICIO A. QUEVEDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: ROMANI MIGUEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040102AMT PAID:$30.00NAME:ARCIA, JOHN P., ESQ175 SW 7TH STREET SUITE 2000MIAMI FL 33130COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:09/13/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160171AMT PAID:$406.00NAME:ARCIA, JOHN P., ESQ175 SW 7TH STREET SUITE 2000MIAMI FL 33130COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$406.00RECEIPT DATE:08/27/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33355:3482; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less