This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/05/2020 at 12:27:02 (UTC).

SKYLINE ON BRICKELL CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. VS SKYLINE 506T, LLC (TR)

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 SKYLINE ON BRICKELL CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SKYLINE 506T, LLC TR. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SKYLINE ON BRICKELL CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

Defendant

SKYLINE 506T, LLC (TR)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Damas, Kenneth

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover

12/19/2019 - Civil Cover

Complaint

12/19/2019 - Complaint

Civil Cover

12/19/2019 - Civil Cover

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/26/2019 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/26/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

12/19/2019 - Lis Pendens

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/30/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/30/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

01/14/2020 - Service Returned

Voluntary Dismissal

01/27/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31795:2096; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SKYLINE 506T LLC (TR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SKYLINE 506T LLC (TR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3430127AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:DAMAS, KENNETH LAW OFFICES OF ADORNO-CUNILL & DUMAS PL 1000 BRICK MIAMI FL 33131-3014 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3310014AMT PAID:$406.00 NAME:DAMAS, KENNETH LAW OFFICES OF ADORNO-CUNILL & DUMAS PL 1000 BRICK MIAMI FL 33131-3014 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 31751:955; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SKYLINE ON BRICKELL CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Damas, Kenneth