This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/22/2020 at 11:39:16 (UTC).

SKY FLORIDA SERVICE, LLC D/B/A CLEANPRO VS LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 SKY FLORIDA SERVICE, LLC D/B/A CLEANPRO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sky Florida Service, LLC d/b/a CleanPro

Defendant

Lexington Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Velasquez, Sol G., ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Steven C Teeagy

 

Court Documents

Notice:

04/01/2020 - Notice:

AgreedOrder

03/19/2020 - AgreedOrder

Motion for Extension of Time

03/13/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

03/06/2020 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/24/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/22/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/19/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/18/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Interrogatory

02/13/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Taking Deposition

02/13/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Production

02/13/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/13/2020 - Request for Admissions

Complaint

02/13/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANDING DEFENDANTS EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3620053AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:VELASQUEZ, SOL G., ESQ GIMENEZ & CARRILLO, LLC 5775 BLUE LAGOON DRIVE, SU MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lexington Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450026AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:VELASQUEZ, SOL G., ESQ GIMENEZ & CARRILLO, LLC 5775 BLUE LAGOON DRIVE, SU MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lexington Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580256AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:VELASQUEZ, SOL G., ESQ GIMENEZ & CARRILLO, LLC 5775 BLUE LAGOON DRIVE, SU MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING AC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.