Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/17/2021 at 01:42:40 (UTC).

SINGER HEALTH CENTER VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 SINGER HEALTH CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINGER HEALTH CENTER

Assignor

WRIGHT, ARIEN N.

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Swaebe, Theodore A

Defendant Attorney

Dichek, Jarred S., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

04/27/2021 - Memorandum of Disposition

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

04/27/2021 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/27/2021 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

04/26/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

04/05/2021 - Service Returned

Pre Trial Summons

03/19/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Interrogatory

03/10/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

03/10/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

03/10/2021 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

03/10/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/10/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: Miami Beach Courtroom 2-1 1130 Washington Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2140006AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/19/2021 REGISTER#:214CASHIER:DYROFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2590012AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:SWAEBE, THEODORE A 1 SE 3RD AVE STE 3020 MIAMI FL 33131-1700 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/12/2021 REGISTER#:259CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Singer Health Center is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWAEBE , THEODORE