This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/03/2021 at 08:20:37 (UTC).

SINFLONI CORP., VS MOUNT VERNON FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 SINFLONI CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MOUNT VERNON FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINFLONI CORP.,

Defendants

UNITED STATES LIABILITY CO.,

UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE GROUP

MOUNT VERNON FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ladd, Matthew E.

Defendant Attorneys

Gary Khutorsky

Carlton, Stephanie H

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/07/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/07/2021 - Complaint

Notice of Service of Process

07/27/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

Amended Complaint

08/17/2021 - Amended Complaint

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/07/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

09/13/2021 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Request for Admissions

09/17/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

09/20/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Admissions

09/21/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

09/21/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Response to Request for Admissions

10/18/2021 - Response to Request for Admissions

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Carlton Stephanie H; MOUNT VERNON FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MOUNT VERNON FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MOUNT VERNON FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2310040AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/26/2021 REGISTER#:231CASHIER:MAYRAES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MOUNT VERNON FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070533AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:LADD, MATTHEW E. 4649 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 301 CORAL GABLES FL 33146-2118 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/09/2021 REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MOUNT VERNON FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Khutorsky

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlton, Stephanie H