This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/07/2020 at 18:22:02 (UTC).

SILVERMAN CHIROPRACTIC & REHABILITATION CENTER VS GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 SILVERMAN CHIROPRACTIC REHABILITATION CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Silverman Chiropractic & Rehabilitation Center

Assignor

Castano, Armando

Defendant

Government Employees Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leon, John Williams

Defendant Attorney

Hernandez, Cristina Maria

 

Court Documents

Request for Production

06/28/2019 - Request for Production

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

06/28/2019 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Request for Production

06/27/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

06/27/2019 - Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

06/27/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/29/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Letter of Correspondence

03/26/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

Notice of Service of Process

03/26/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Statement of Claim

01/29/2019 - Statement of Claim

Response to Request for Admissions

06/28/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

06/28/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

06/28/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

06/27/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Appearance

06/27/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Memorandum of Disposition

04/01/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

03/29/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Email Notice:

03/26/2019 - Email Notice:

Pre Trial Summons

02/07/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31641:2771; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2790027AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$360.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/08/2019 REGISTER#:279CASHIER:DANTHOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3540022AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:LEON, JOHN WILLIAMS 8000 GOVERNOR'S SQUARE BLVD PH404 MIAMI LAKES FL 33016 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less