This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/28/2022 at 20:16:11 (UTC).

SILVERLAND MEDICAL CENTER VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 SILVERLAND MEDICAL CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVERLAND MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

Assignee

Colon, Ricardo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Patino Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

Martinez, Daniel Antonio

 

Court Documents

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

06/24/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Process

05/28/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Interrogatory

11/14/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

07/19/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Appearance

06/12/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Discovery

06/20/2019 - Request for Discovery

Memorandum of Disposition

07/10/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

06/12/2019 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Memorandum of Disposition

05/29/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion:

05/26/2020 - Motion:

Motion:

05/26/2020 - Motion:

Motion:

05/26/2020 - Motion:

Motion:

05/19/2020 - Motion:

Motion:

05/19/2020 - Motion:

Motion:

05/19/2020 - Motion:

Notice of Interrogatory

05/08/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Response to Request for Production

04/03/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

04/03/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

95 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 32754:2121; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Sanctions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Sanctions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Sanctions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Sanctions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Sanctions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Sanctions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2490017AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM5005 LEJEUNE ROADHIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:05/17/2019REGISTER#:249CASHIER:MATTIEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520009AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRMCOMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:04/18/2019REGISTER#:352CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVERLAKE MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant