This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/02/2021 at 19:55:04 (UTC).

SILVERLAND AND MEDICAL CENTER VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 SILVERLAND AND MEDICAL CENTER filed an Other lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellant

SILVERLAND AND MEDICAL CENTER

Appellee

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

SANTOS, FRANCISCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee and Appellant Attorneys

Patino, Richard

Douglas Howard Stein

Appellee Attorneys

Brehm, Douglas Gerard

Nordby, Daniel Elden

Tozier, Garrett A.

 

Court Documents

Order:

04/30/2021 - Order:

Order:

03/31/2021 - Order:

Appeal Transfer Form

01/12/2021 - Appeal Transfer Form

Notice of Filing:

12/28/2020 - Notice of Filing:

Response to Motion

12/02/2020 - Response to Motion

Order:

12/01/2020 - Order:

Text

11/30/2020 - Text

Appellant's Initial Brief

11/30/2020 - Appellant's Initial Brief

Motion to Supplement

11/30/2020 - Motion to Supplement

Motion for Attorneys Fees

11/30/2020 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Request for Oral Argument

11/30/2020 - Request for Oral Argument

Notice of Appearance

11/30/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Order:

11/19/2020 - Order:

Estimated Cost Received

10/23/2020 - Estimated Cost Received

Appeal Invoice

10/16/2020 - Appeal Invoice

Appeal Index

10/16/2020 - Appeal Index

Record Completed

10/16/2020 - Record Completed

Motion for Attorneys Fees

09/22/2020 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3RD DCA ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD ON APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: 3RD DCA ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD ON APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appeal Transfer Form; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF AGREEMENT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE ANSWER BRIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 20-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: STATEMENT OF COSTS AMT. $222.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appellant's Initial Brief; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Supplement; Event Type: Event; Comments: (APPELLANT'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event; Comments: (APPPELLANT'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Appeal Index; Event Type: Event; Comments: Complete Date: 10/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Record Completed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Complete Date: 10/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Record on Appeal.; Event Type: Event; Comments: Complete Date: 10/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event; Comments: APPELLEE'S Complete Date: 09/22/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: GARRETT A. TOZIER Complete Date: 09/22/2020 Parties: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: DANIEL E. NORDBY Complete Date: 09/22/2020 Parties: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Record Assigned To; Event Type: Event; Comments: REVENIA S WITHERSPOON Complete Date: 09/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties; Event Type: Event; Comments: Complete Date: 09/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appeal filed; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVERLAKE MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARD PATINO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stein, Douglas H