This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/25/2021 at 13:30:24 (UTC).

SILVER CHIROPRACTIC & WELLNESS VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 SILVER CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVER CHIROPRACTIC & WELLNESS

Assignor

Torres-Sugitani, Kazumi

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

Defendant Attorney

Dichek, Jarred S., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/21/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/21/2020 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

01/30/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Service of Process

02/24/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

02/24/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

02/27/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Memorandum of Disposition

02/28/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/28/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Email Notice:

03/05/2020 - Email Notice:

Request for Admissions

03/05/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

03/05/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

03/05/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion for Protective Order

03/19/2020 - Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Extension of Time

03/20/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Compliance

03/30/2020 - Notice of Compliance

Demand for Jury Trial

03/30/2020 - Demand for Jury Trial

Motion for Extension of Time

04/06/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event; Comments: RULE 2.516(B)(1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Protective Order; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: Caleb Courtroom 2-2 5400 N.W. 22nd Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2290059AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/30/2020 REGISTER#:229CASHIER:JONESP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580012AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVER CHIROPRACTIC & WELLNESS AS ASSIGNEE OF MICHAEL WALKER is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.