This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/07/2020 at 07:31:05 (UTC).

SILVA, WANDA VS LOPEZ LAPINEL, ARIEL LUIS

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 SILVA, WANDA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LOPEZ LAPINEL, ARIEL LUIS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Silva, Wanda

Respondent

Lopez Lapinel, Ariel Luis

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

03/17/2020 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: UNCONTESTED FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31859:2319; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: DATED FOR03-19-20209:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Aff/Cert of Corroborating Witness; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgement of Receipt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Acknowledgment of Status Quo Temp Domestic Relations Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Index of Forms; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Application for Determination of Indigent Status Approved; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Waiver; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2340009AMT PAID:$409.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$409.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/14/2020 REGISTER#:234CASHIER:NDEG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Courthouse Center; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.