This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/30/2021 at 22:02:22 (UTC).

SHEILA BORDES VS MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 SHEILA BORDES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MIAMI-DADE COUNTY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bordes, Sheila

Defendant

Miami-Dade County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Panter, Mitchell J

Defendant Attorneys

Ramos-Barreau, Nicole

Levin, Sabrina

 

Court Documents

Notice of Interrogatory

07/23/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Appearance

08/30/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Complaint

07/23/2021 - Complaint

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/02/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

08/30/2021 - Notice of Appearance

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/30/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/23/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Request for Production

07/23/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

07/23/2021 - Request for Admissions

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Miami-Dade County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ramos-Barreau Nicole; Miami-Dade County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: MIAMI DADE COUNTY Parties: Miami-Dade County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVED ON DEE GARVIN. Parties: Miami-Dade County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Miami-Dade County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090231AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:PANTER, MITCHELL J6950 N KENDALL DRMIAMI FL 33156-1584COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:07/31/2021REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2980158AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:PANTER, MITCHELL J6950 N KENDALL DRMIAMI FL 33156-1584COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:07/24/2021REGISTER#:298CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less