This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/11/2020 at 19:17:31 (UTC).

SF MANGO INVESTMENTS, LLC VS. JASMINE BELL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 SF MANGO INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JASMINE BELL. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SF MANGO INVESTMENTS, LLC

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

Bell, Jasmine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carrero, Raymond, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Issued

03/18/2020 - Writ of Possession Issued

Final Judgment by Judge

03/04/2020 - Final Judgment by Judge

Final Judgment by Judge

03/04/2020 - Final Judgment by Judge

Notice:

03/04/2020 - Notice:

Certificate of Service

03/04/2020 - Certificate of Service

Motion to Strike

03/03/2020 - Motion to Strike

Answer

02/28/2020 - Answer

Service Returned

02/26/2020 - Service Returned

Motion for Default

02/26/2020 - Motion for Default

Complaint

02/13/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: WRIT SENT TO SHERIFF WITH $302 CHECK Parties: Bell Jasmine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31844:1616; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ANSWER REVIEWED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Bell Jasmine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020018AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/20/2020 REGISTER#:302CASHIER:LEB2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Bell Jasmine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Bell Jasmine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3550027AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:CARRERO, RAYMOND, ESQ RAYMOND CARRERO PA 10631 NORTH KENDALL DRIVE SUITE MIAMI FL 33176 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.